Simplification Set – 16

1. 48 × 27 + 5088 ÷ 53 – 65% of 560 = 2x + 4
A) 7
B) 11
C) 8
D) 10
E) 9

Answer & Explanation

 Option D
Solution: 

1028 = 2x + 4
2x = 1024
x = 10

 

2. √4761 + 85 × 26 – 272 – 35% of 760 = x
A) 1642
B) 1284
C) 1526
D) 1374
E) 1235

Answer & Explanation

  Option B

 

3. 36% of 550 – 14% of 650 + 35% of 420 – 55% of 380 = x
A) 53
B) 45
C) 34
D) 57
E) 37

Answer & Explanation

 Option B

 

4. 26 × 37 + 47% of 250 – 65% of 490 = x
A) 696
B) 835
C) 713
D) 761
E) 668

Answer & Explanation

  Option D

 

5. 43 (3060 ÷ (26+59)) – 2592 ÷ (16 × 18) = x
A) 1156
B) 1489
C) 1529
D) 1729
E) 1539

Answer & Explanation

 Option E

 

6. 3 1/4 + 2 2/5 – 4 3/8 + 2 1/2 = x
A) 3 31/40
B) 4 5/8
C) 3 7/8
D) 3 33/40
E) None of these

Answer & Explanation

 Option A
Solution:

3 1/4 + 2 2/5 – 4 3/8 + 2 1/2
= 3+2-4+2 + (1/4 + 2/5 – 3/8 + 1/2)
= 3 + 31/40 = 3 31/40

 

7. 4 3/4  + 2 1/3 + 1 5/6 – 3 5/8 = x
A) 4 33/24
B) 5 5/6
C) 5 11/24
D) 4 5/6
E) 5 7/24

Answer & Explanation

 Option E
4 3/4  + 2 1/3 + 1 5/6 – 3 5/8
= 4+2+1-3 + (3/4 + 1/3 + 5/6 – 5/8)
= 4 + (1 7/24) =  5 + 7/24 = 5 7/24

 

8. √2916 ÷ 16 × 288 – 15% of 680 – √1444 × 12 = x
A) 482
B) 414
C) 539
D) 561
E) 523

Answer & Explanation

  Option B

 

9. 342 – 24% of 850 – 85% of 760 = x% of 170
A) 140
B) 16
C) 180
D) 18
E) 14

Answer & Explanation

 Option C

 

10. 262 – 192 + 372 – 432 + 122 = 7x
A) 3
B) 2
C) 4
D) -3
E) -4

Answer & Explanation

 Option D

Leave a Comment

Your email address will not be published.